CA SB1386 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53750.5 to the Government Code, relating to local government finance.
Title
Local government: assessments, fees, and charges: water: hydrants.
Sponsors
Sen. John Moorlach [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1386 Moorlach Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1386 Moorlach et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB1386 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1386 Moorlach et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB1386 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5280.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3688.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3576.) (May 21). |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 21. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53750.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |