CA SB1399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2670, 2671, 2673, 2673.1, and 2675.5 of, and to add Section 2673.2 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: garment manufacturing.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1399 Durazo et al (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1399 Durazo et al (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3840.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3772.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2020-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2670 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2671 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2673 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2673.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2673.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 2675.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |