CA SB14 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 70.3 (commencing with Section 101200) to Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to education finance, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds.
Title
Education finance: Higher Education Facilities Bond Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB14 Glazer et al (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB14 Glazer et al (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1209.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1087.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 550.) (April 3). |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 101200 | New Code | See Bill Text |