CA SB1410 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1947.20 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 1161.2 of, and to add and repeal Sections 1161.05 and 1179.1 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, and to add Section 19535 to, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.10, 17154.5, 19534, 23610, and 24311 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
COVID-19 emergency: tenancies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1410 Caballero et al (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1410 Caballero et al (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3872.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3809.) (June 23). |
2020-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3801.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Set for hearing June 23 in APPR. pending receipt. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Set for hearing June 22. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3748.) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3604.) (May 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., JUD., and HOUSING. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161.05 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1179.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1947.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17154.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19534 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19535 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23610 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24311 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |