CA SB1437 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1015, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1015, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 188 and 189 of, and to add Section 1170.95 to, the Penal Code, relating to murder.
Title
Accomplice liability for felony murder.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1437 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1437 Skinner Senate Third Reading By MEDINA (Y: 42 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1437 Skinner et al (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1437 Skinner Senate Third Reading By MEDINA (Y: 42 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1437 Skinner et al (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1015, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 6034.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 36. Page 6925.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4393.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4310.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4820.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1192.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1425 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 188 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 189 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |