CA SB144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7158, 7159.5, 7159.14, 7161, 9807, 9848, and 9882.14 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 27706, 27707, 27750, 27752, 27756, 27757, 29550, 29551, 50050, 68085, 68085.1, 68085.5, 68085.7, 68085.8, 76000.10, and 76223 of, to add Section 6111 to, and to repeal Sections 22712, 27753, 29550.1, 29550.2, and 29550.3 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 273a, 273d, 273.1, 295, 670, 987, 987.2, 1000.3, 1001.90, 1202.4, 1202.42, 1203, 1203.016, 1203.018, 1203.097, 1203.1, 1203.1ab, 1203.1d, 1203.9, 1205, 1208, 1208.2, 1208.3, 1211, 1463, 1463.010, 2085.5, 2085.6, 2085.7, and 4024.2 of, to add Section 1465.9 to, and to repeal Sections 987.4, 987.5, 987.8, 987.81, 1001.15, 1001.16, 1203.1b, 1203.1bb, 1203.1c, 1203.1e, 1203.1m, 1210.15, 1214.1, 1214.5, 3010.8, and 6266 of, the Penal Code, to amend Sections 13386, 23573, 23575.3, 40509, 40510.5, 40512, 42007, 42008.5, and 42008.7 of, to add Section 44237 to, and to repeal Section 40508.5 of, the Vehicle Code, and to amend Sections 903.45 and 904 of, and to repeal Section 903.3 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB144 Mitchell et al (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-27AssemblyAugust 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-07-09AssemblyJuly 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-25AssemblyJune 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1365.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1090.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 802.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7158Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7159.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7159.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7161Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9807Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9848Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9882.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22712Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code27706Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27707Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27750Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27752Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27753Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code27756Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27757Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code29550Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code29550.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code29550.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code29550.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code29551Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code50050Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6111New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code68085Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68085.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68085.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68085.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68085.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code76000.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code76223Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1000.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1001.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1001.16Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1001.90Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1202.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1202.42Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.016Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.018Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.097Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1205Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1208Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1208.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1208.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1210.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1211Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1214.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1214.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1463Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1463.010Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1465.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code2085.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2085.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2085.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code273Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code273.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code295Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3010.8Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4024.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6266Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code670Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.8Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.81Repealed CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code13386Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code23573Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code23575.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40508.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40509Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40510.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40512Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code42007Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code42008.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code42008.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code44237New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code903.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code903.45Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code904Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback