CA SB1447 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 6902.7 and 6902.8 to, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.72 and 23627 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income tax: sales and use tax: credit: small business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1447 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Cervantes (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1447 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB1447 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1447 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB1447 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5465.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | (Corrected August 29). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(b)(17) suspended. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5255.) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Limón. |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | (Corrected August 19). |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2020-08-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3687.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (May 19). |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-05-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.72 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23627 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6902.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6902.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |