CA SB1473 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 371, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 371, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11010.3 of, and to repeal the heading of Article 2.5 of Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 52323, 52324, and 52325 of the Food and Agriculture Code, to amend Sections 915, 915.2, 915.4, 15643, 15645, 15646, 23010, 25131, 51179, 53340, and 65940.1 of the Government Code, to amend Section 20995 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 20124, 20391, and 20404 of, the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 214.18, 439.2, and 6388.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Section 50906 of the Water Code, and to amend Section 17609.05 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to local government, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Local Government Omnibus Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1473 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1473 GOV. & F. (McGuire) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1473 GOV. & F (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1473 GOV. & F. (McGuire) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1473 GOV. & F (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 371, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5444.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3684.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3577.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 21. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-03-23 | Senate | (Corrected March 23). |
2020-03-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 12. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11010.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 52323 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 52324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 52325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20124 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 20391 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 20404 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 20995 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 439.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6388.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 50906 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 17609.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |