CA SB153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 838, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 838, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 81001, 81002, 81003, 81004, 81005, and 81006 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 81000 of, and to add Sections 81004.5, 81012, 81013, 81014, and 81015 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to industrial hemp, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB153 Wilk et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 153 Wilk Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB153 Wilk et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 153 Wilk Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB153 Wilk et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 838, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2865.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3262.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1221.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1090.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 81000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 81006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |