CA SB159 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 532, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 532, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4052 of, and to add Sections 4052.02 and 4052.03 to, the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 1342.74 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10123.1933 to the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 14132.968 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to HIV prevention.
Title
HIV: preexposure and postexposure prophylaxis.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB159 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 159 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Gipson (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB159 Wiener et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 159 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Gipson (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB159 Wiener et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 532, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2847.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3330.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1196.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1091.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 848.) (April 24). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 598.) (April 8). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4052.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4052.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1342.74 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.1933 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.968 | Amended Code | Citation Text |