CA SB17 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 2016.090 and 2023.050 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil discovery: sanctions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB17 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 17 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB17 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 17 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB17 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 84. Page 2784.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3176.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | June 4 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 797.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 2016.090 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2023.050 | New Code | See Bill Text |