CA SB171 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 12999) to Part 2.8 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employers: annual report: pay data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB171 Jackson (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB171 Jackson (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 2). |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1209.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 552.) (April 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 466.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12999 | New Code | See Bill Text |