CA SB175 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 1367.001 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB175 Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3149.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3100.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 845.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.001 | New Code | See Bill Text |