CA SB182 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 769, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 769, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 16550) to Part 1 of Division 7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Transportation network company: participating drivers: single business license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB182 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 182 Bradford Senate Third Reading By OBERNOLTE (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB182 Bradford (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 182 Bradford Senate Third Reading By OBERNOLTE (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB182 Bradford (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 769, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2691.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 3034.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 18). |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 1141.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Published May 16 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1020.) (May 9). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 944.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 16550 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6254 | Amended Code | Citation Text |