CA SB184 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22760, 22814, 75521, 75523, 75553, 75570, 75571.5, and 75590 of, and to add Sections 75522.5 and 75591.5 to, the Government Code, relating to judges’ retirement, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges’ Retirement System II: deferred retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB184 Moorlach et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 184 Moorlach Senate Third Reading By Cooley (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB184 Moorlach et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-13 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2784.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3179.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1196.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1091.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-08SenateApril 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 466.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-01-31SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback