CA SB187 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1788.2 of the Civil Code, relating to debt collection.
Title
Rosenthal Fair Debt Collection Practices Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 187 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Mayes (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB187 Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB187 Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2907.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | June 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 921.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9). |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1788.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |