CA SB190 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 404, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 404, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51189 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 18931.7 of, and to add Section 13159.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire safety.
Title
Fire safety: building standards: defensible space program.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB190 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 190 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB190 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recomme (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 190 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB190 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recomme (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 404, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3332.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1092.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 622.) (April 9). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 332.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and N.R. & W. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51189 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13159.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18931.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |