CA SB208 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 471, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 471, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2893.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Consumer Call Protection Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB208 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 208 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB208 Hueso et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Apn style="font-weight: bold" title="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 208 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB208 Hueso et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Apn style="font-weight: bold" title="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 471, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2831.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3185.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 10). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | July 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1028.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 464.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2893.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |