CA SB210 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 298, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 44150) to Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 27153 of, and to add Sections 4000.17, 4156.5, 24019, 27158.1, and 27158.2 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Heavy-Duty Vehicle Inspection and Maintenance Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB210 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 210 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB210 Leyva (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 298, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2928.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-12SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2909.)
2019-09-11SenateSet for hearing September 12.
2019-09-11SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-09-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 3333.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-06-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
2019-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1352.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1092.) (May 16).
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 804.) (April 23).
2019-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-03-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 383.) (March 20).
2019-02-15SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and TRANS.
2019-02-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code44150New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code24019New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code27153Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code27158.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code27158.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code4000.17New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code4156.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback