CA SB215 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1005, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1005, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1001.36 of the Penal Code, relating to diversion.
Title
Diversion: mental disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB215 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 215 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 215 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER Amendment Set #1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB215 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 215 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 215 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER Amendment Set #1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB215 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1005, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 5922.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6720.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6513.) |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4125.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4055.) (January 18). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | March 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2605 | New Code | See Bill Text |