CA SB217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - August 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - August 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18897.1, 18897.2, 18897.3, 18897.4, 18897.6, 18897.7, and 113948 of, to add the headings of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 18897) and Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 18897.2) to Part 2.4 of Division 13 of, to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 18897.10), Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 18897.20), Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 18897.30), Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 18897.45), and Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 18897.50) to Part 2.4 of Division 13 of, and to repeal and add Section 18897 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 11165.7 of the Penal Code, relating to camps.
Title
Recreational and organizational camps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB217 Portantino et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB217 Portantino et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | Assembly | August 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | June 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1264.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 113948 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18897 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18897.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18897.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18897.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18897.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18897.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18897.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11165.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |