CA SB221 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 724, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 724, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1367.03 and 1367.031 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10133.53 of, and to add Section 10133.54 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: timely access to care.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB221 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 221 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB221 Wiener et al (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 221 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB221 Wiener et al (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 724, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2884.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1318.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 532.) (March 17). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.54 | New Code | See Bill Text |