CA SB222 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12920, 12921, 12927, 12930, 12931, 12955, 12955.8, 12956.1, and 12956.2 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: veteran or military status.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB222 Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB222 Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 222 Hill Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB222 Hill et al (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB222 Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 222 Hill Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB222 Hill et al (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2950.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3548.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(a)(14) suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 18. Page 3203.) |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12927 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |