CA SB222 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 116930) to Part 12 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to water.
Title
Water Rate Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB222 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 222 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB222 Dodd et al (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 222 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB222 Dodd et al (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5312.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Robert Rivas. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Robert Rivas. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and U. & E. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1319.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 985.) (April 29). |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 2. Page 755.) (April 12). |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | March 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ., E., U. & C., and JUD. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116930 | New Code | See Bill Text |