CA SB224 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 489 of, and to add Section 487k to, the Penal Code, relating to grand theft.
Title
Grand theft: agricultural equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 224 Grove Senate Third Reading By PATTERSON (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB224 Grove et al (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB224 Grove et al (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2491.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 919.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 2). |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 487 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 489 | Amended Code | Citation Text |