CA SB227 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1279 and 1280.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health and care facilities.
Title
Health and care facilities: inspections and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB227 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 227 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Smith (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB227 Leyva et al (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 227 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Smith (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB227 Leyva et al (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2500.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2953.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (July 10). |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 25). |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | June 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 996.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1279 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1280.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |