CA SB232 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 25214.13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous substances.
Title
Hazardous substances: regulated metals: packaging materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB232 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 232 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - SB 232 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB232 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 232 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - SB 232 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB232 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-09-27 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-09-27 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2530.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Ordered to unfinished business. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Dodd. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2234.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 559.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 384.) (March 20). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25214.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |