CA SB239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 801.3 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: limitations of actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Date (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB239 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Date (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB239 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 801.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |