CA SB240 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 270.1 of the Penal Code, relating to truancy.
Title
Truancy: collective action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-26 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-19 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 948.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2011-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 741.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-05 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-10 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 270.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |