CA SB240 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21080.27 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: renewable energy projects on disturbed land.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | April 29 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 857.) Reconsideration granted. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |