CA SB254 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17039.3, 17158, 23005, and 24317 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income taxes: corporation taxes: transfer of tax losses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB254 Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3152.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3141.) (January 23). |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | (Corrected January 6). |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 850.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17039.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17158 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24317 | New Code | See Bill Text |