CA SB268 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9401, 9403, 9405, and 13119 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 9400) of Division 9 of, to add Section 9406 to, and to repeal and add Section 9400 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ballot measures: local taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB268 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 268 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB268 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-13 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2919.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-12SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2908.)
2019-09-10SenateSet for hearing September 12.
2019-09-10SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2733.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-09-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 3208.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3).
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-06-18AssemblyJune 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1184.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1094.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 621.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code13119Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9400New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9401Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9403Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9405Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9406New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code95504Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11151Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11155Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11155.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11155.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11155.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11157.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11257Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11257.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11260Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11322.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11375Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14140Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18923Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback