CA SB292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 12966 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Wildfire risk reporting.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB292 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB292 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and G.O. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 652.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and V.A. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12966 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |