CA SB31 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 826, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 826, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8310.3 to the Government Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Religious Freedom Act: state agencies: disclosure of religious affiliation information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB31 Lara et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 31 Lara Third Reading Urgency By CHIU (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB31 Lara et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 31 Lara Third Reading Urgency By CHIU (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB31 Lara et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 826, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3000.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3479.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 581.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Published March 28 at 4 a.m. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 348.) (March 13). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | March 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 6. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 130.) (January 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Set for hearing January 31. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8310.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |