CA SB310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 591, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 591, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 203 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to juries.
Title
Jury service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB310 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 310 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 310 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 591, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2834.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 3195.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 28). |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | July 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | June 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1096.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 798.) (April 23). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | April 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 526.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |