CA SB316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 270, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 270, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 215.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil and student safety.
Title
Pupil and student safety: identification cards: domestic violence hotline telephone number.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] |
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB316 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SB 316 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Quirk-Silva (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB316 Rubio et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SB 316 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Quirk-Silva (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB316 Rubio et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 270, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2235.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2752.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1216.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 464.) (March 27). |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 215.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |