CA SB318 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - July 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.)
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - July 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.)
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1632, 1761, 1788.2, and 1799.90 of the Civil Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Consumer protections: contracts and agreements to finance or secure a bail bond or immigration bond.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB318 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB318 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and INS. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1200.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1096.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1761 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1799.90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |