CA SB320 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51.6 of the Civil Code, relating to civil rights.
Title
Gender: discrimination: pricing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [05-01-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 51.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |