CA SB323 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 848, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 848, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5100, 5105, 5110, 5115, 5125, 5145, and 5200 of, and to add Section 5910.1 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB323 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB323 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 323 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB323 Wieckowski (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB323 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 323 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB323 Wieckowski (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 848, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2950.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 28. Page 3573.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 9). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 19). |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1367.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 890.) (April 30). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2). |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HOUSING. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 5100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5910.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |