CA SB326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6150 of, and to add Sections 5551 and 5986 to, the Civil Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Common interest developments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB326 Hill Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 326 Hill Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Hill (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 326 Hill Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Hill (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2198.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 6. Page 2671.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (July 2). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 19). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1009.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 891.) (April 30). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 798.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HOUSING. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 5551 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 5986 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 6150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |