CA SB329 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12927 and 12955 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: housing: source of income.
Sponsors
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB329 Mitchell et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 329 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB329 Mitchell et al (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 329 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB329 Mitchell et al (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 21. Page 3317.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1269.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1096.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 906.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | April 23 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | March 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12927 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |