CA SB33 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14009.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: estate recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB33 Hernandez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB33 Hernandez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on the inactive file. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 434.) (March 25). |
2015-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14009.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |