CA SB33 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10072.4 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Electronic benefits transfer system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB33 Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB33 Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3152.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3141.) (January 23). |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3079.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 13. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10072.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |