CA SB339 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 6789, 7874, and 8790.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Engineers, land surveyors, and geologists and geophysicists: nondisclosure agreements: reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB339 Jones (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-30 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-07-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2049.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-07-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-07-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2570.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-18AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2019-06-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 963.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 768.) (April 22).
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6770.4.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code6789New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7874New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code8776Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8790.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback