CA SB34 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26001, 26153, 26161, and 26162.5 of, and to add Section 26071 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 34010, 34011, and 34012 of, and to add and repeal Sections 6414 and 34012.1 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: donations.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB34 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 34 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB34 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 34 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB34 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2845.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3326.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | July 1 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1167.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 511.) (April 1). |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 384.) (March 20). |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and B., P. & E.D. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | (Corrected December 7). |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26071 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 26162.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34012.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6414 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |