CA SB341 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22324 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 7507.5, 20229, 100014, and 100032 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 220 of the Labor Code, relating to public employment, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public employment and retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [03-27-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | March 27 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 466.) Reconsideration granted. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20229 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7507.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |