CA SB367 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 701, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 701, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 31111 and 31119 of, and to add Section 31122 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.
Title
State Coastal Conservancy: grants: educational projects and programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB367 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 367 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB367 Hueso (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 367 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB367 Hueso (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 701, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2842.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 3266.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | July 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 960.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 439.) (March 26). |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 31111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 31119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 31122 | New Code | See Bill Text |