CA SB369 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 9 (commencing with Section 14070) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Prisoners: California Reentry Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 369 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB369 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB369 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB369 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB369 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2020-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5417.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | August 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1153.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 805.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14070 | New Code | See Bill Text |