CA SB372 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 12024.13, 21608.5, and 23671 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 47605.1, 47612.1, and 52052 of the Education Code, to amend, repeal, and add Section 8585.8 of the Government Code, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 186.2 and 186.8 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 12165 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 14526.5, 14571.5, 14571.8, and 42889 of, to amend and repeal Section 17002 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 615, 5845.8, 14315, 14411, 17000, 17001, 17003, 19535, 31178, 40003, 42476, 48653, 80016, and 80136 of, to add Section 14100.5 to, to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 14600) to Division 12.1 of, to add Chapter 20.5 (commencing with Section 42984) to Part 3 of Division 30 of, to repeal Section 40511 of, and to repeal and add Division 12.1 (commencing with Section 14500) of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 17153.5 and 24315 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 2370 and 2382 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 79714 of the Water Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Beverage Container Recycling Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB372 Wieckowski Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB372 Wieckowski (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB372 Wieckowski (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3169.) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wieckowski. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 10. Page 3169.) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3141.) (January 23). |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3099.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |