CA SB373 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 103526.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records.
Title
County recorder: vital records: blockchain technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB373 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and HEALTH. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 957.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103526.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |